Trustees THE BROMSGROVE UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1077135
Charity reporting is overdue by 178 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Byrne | Chair | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Demeris Prichard | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Margaret Whitehead | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Irene Joyce Collett | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Judith Flora Leslie | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Shearwood | Trustee | 21 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.