FRIENDS OF ST. DUNSTAN'S CHURCH, CHEAM

Charity number: 1075304
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £361 £1.53k £752 £764 £420
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £5.12k £128
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A