Trustees THE TREFOIL GUILD
Charity number: 1075232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eileen Martin | Chair | 17 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Karen Mathews | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Jean Kelly | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Cochrane | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Evelyn Erika Walker | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Diack | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Patricia Crane | Trustee | 14 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheran Oke | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ellen Martin | Trustee | 13 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Christine Leete | Trustee | 12 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Bollom | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hogg | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Watson | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Heather Hern | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.