ALBANIAN COMMUNITY "FAIK KONICA" IN THE UK

Charity number: 1076004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £21.52k £8.86k £36.63k £5.84k £8.65k
Total expenditure £12.91k £15.98k £22.06k £18.13k £8.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.50k N/A £11.72k N/A N/A