Trustees EAST STREET ARTS
Charity number: 1077401
Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Satdeep Singh Sambhi | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Kate Iredale | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Brian O'Hare | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Wilson | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles William Arnold | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Marianne Brady OBE | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rodolfo Alexandre Barradas Simoes | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Mark Ramshaw | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Minoti Parikh | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roy Andrew Jonathan Stuart Gillam | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bhavisha Kukadai-Moran | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Clare Price | Trustee | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.