Financial history ST CHRISTOPHER'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1076643
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £128.94k £127.27k £115.52k £108.54k £83.17k
Total expenditure £108.99k £110.55k £111.33k £106.21k £101.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £127.02k £114.75k £108.44k £83.08k