Financial history The Patricia Routledge Foundation

Charity number: 1077862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £179.30k £163.76k £166.53k £187.12k £244.65k
Total expenditure £181.35k £161.92k £196.93k £213.32k £266.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A