Trustees BRITISH SOCIETY FOR GYNAECOLOGICAL ENDOSCOPY TRUST
Charity number: 1077892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Kent MD FRCOG | Chair | 19 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Oudai Ali MBCHB | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samantha Kirkwood MA MBBS | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sujata Gupta MBBS MD | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Lina Antoun MD, MRCOG | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Hirsch MRCOG | Trustee | 21 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zahid Khan MBChB | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Di Donato | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Mallick MBChB | Trustee | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gilly Macdonald BSc NMC | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angus Thomson MB FRCOG | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karolina Afors MBBS BSc | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Bell | Trustee | 23 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Adamczyk MD | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Funlayo Odejinmi BSc FRCOG | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Arvind Vashisht | Trustee | 19 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Donna Ghosh MBBS MRCOG | Trustee | 17 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fevzi Shakir BSc MRCOG | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KIRANA SAMPATH ARAMBAGE MRCOG | Trustee | 06 June 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.