ST MICHAEL'S CENTRE, FULHAM

Charity number: 1077598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £68.31k £99.67k £68.21k £21.37k £14.69k
Total expenditure £63.04k £103.48k £82.50k £33.86k £13.38k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £660 £28.90k N/A N/A