THE DARWIN GARDENS TRUST

Charity number: 1076377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.50k £16.12k £15.35k £15.13k £11.78k
Total expenditure £8.52k £3.36k £8.07k £10.63k £3.98k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.50k £0 N/A N/A £11.78k