Financial history TRIALOGUE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1076660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £308.48k £159.05k £123.13k £81.87k £74.20k
Total expenditure £278.12k £153.85k £137.03k £87.30k £75.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £12.10k £24.19k