Financial history MISS EDITH MARY SAGE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1076849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 12/05/2017 12/05/2018 12/05/2019 12/05/2020 12/05/2021
Total gross income £36.88k £29.89k £37.25k £17.20k £13.31k
Total expenditure £38.10k £31.96k £45.11k £22.35k £34.17k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A