THE LADY MARY COURTENAY'S GOOSEFIELD MILLENNIUM GREEN

Charity number: 1077849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £1.89k £3.82k £7.77k £4.24k £3.16k
Total expenditure £1.45k £1.79k £1.11k £3.57k £1.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A