Accounts and annual returns DUNSTABLE AND DISTRICT DISABLED SPORTS

Charity number: 1078359
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2020 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 28 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 28 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 02 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required