Trustees BOROUGH MARKET (SOUTHWARK)
Charity number: 1076940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Lam | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danny Homan | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tim Cochrane | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eva George | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHANE HOLLAND | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Erica Sibree | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shawn Anderson | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daisy Dunlop | Trustee | 26 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE PRITCHARD | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|||||
ADRIAN BUNNIS | Trustee | 25 November 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.