"ZISIZE" THE HEATON LEE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1085470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £31.73k £51.08k £33.05k £25.42k £23.69k
Total expenditure £17.00k £45.00k £26.50k £37.58k £38.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A