THE PROSTATE PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Develop a world class clinical based Research unit at the University of Surrey. Increase awareness of prostate cancer and encourage early detection and action by men and GPs Support the Royal Surrey County and Frimley Park Hospitals to be centres of excellence in the diagnosis and treatment of Prostate Cancer. Create a new NHS Urology Centre for the South West and North Hants Cancer Network
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People
11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 December 1999: Standard registration
- THE PROSTATE PROJECT (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Davies | Chair | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Anthony George Boden | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Wootton | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart McGuire | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Whitby | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Campbell Bolton | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Matthew James Alexander Perry | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carla Perna | Trustee | 06 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Roger John Bott | Trustee | 11 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR STEPHEN EDMUND MAXIM LANGLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR HARDEV SINGH PANDHA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £366.90k | £439.37k | £236.57k | £254.44k | £359.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £710.62k | £477.70k | £239.20k | £322.36k | £366.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 07 November 2019 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4TH NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM PROSTATE CANCER AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION ABOUT THE DISEASE AND ITS EARLY DIAGNOSIS AND THE UNDERTAKING OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF PROSTATE CANCER PROVIDED THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH IS PUBLISHED OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stokes Centre for Urology
Royal Surrey County Hospital
Egerton Road
GUILDFORD
GU2 7XX
- Phone:
- 07724 465 883
- Email:
- info@prostate-project.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window