Governing document RADIO REGEN
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 1999, 15 MARCH 2001, 19 MAY 2006 AND 24 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 SEP 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR FOR THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE UNEMPLOYED OR OTHERWISE DISADVANTAGED, BY PROVIDING TRAINING IN THE SKILLS REQUIRED FOR RADIO BROADCASTING AND MEDIA COMMUNICATION WHICH WILL ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO BECOME SELF-SUPPORTING OR GAIN FULL EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST REGION OF ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.