Accounts and annual returns STREETZ AHEAD- DANCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE
Charity number: 1078388
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 03 October 2016 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 14 January 2016 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2015
(These accounts |
13 January 2016 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 16 January 2015 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 16 January 2015 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 12 May 2014 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 12 May 2014 | 101 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window