Financial history SOUTH LONDON TAMIL WELFARE GROUP

Charity number: 1077602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £34.10k £45.71k £35.22k £61.69k £50.44k
Total expenditure £49.75k £47.29k £46.23k £24.48k £17.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A