THE NETWORK CHURCH

Charity number: 1078577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £89.71k £83.69k £106.30k £96.73k £108.95k
Total expenditure £82.15k £76.86k £120.45k £110.50k £107.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A