Trustees CARN BREA VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1085642
Charity reporting is overdue by 172 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW TRETHOWAN | Chair | 21 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Allan Finlay | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Old | Trustee | 05 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Barratt | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Barrett | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Barrett | Trustee | 05 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FROST | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
VICKY TRETHOWAN | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL KITE | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MS P KURZFIELD | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
WAYNE FROST | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE BRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.