Financial history SPRINGFIELD RESTORATION MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1082550
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £3.50k £4.00k £4.27k £5.07k £5.38k
Total expenditure £3.29k £3.75k £4.14k £4.04k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A