GORRAN AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY BUS ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1082203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £26.57k £27.30k £25.60k £26.72k £73.53k
Total expenditure £24.13k £27.61k £23.55k £23.22k £15.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.12k £7.29k £7.26k £7.02k £11.43k