THE FRIENDS OF FLAXLEY CHURCH

Charity number: 1078041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £4.11k £1.81k £3.52k £2.61k £1.79k
Total expenditure £5.17k £1.62k £1.34k £12 £12
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A