Trustees MENAI BRIDGE COMMUNITY HERITAGE TRUST LTD
Charity number: 1082013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter George Alexander | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Robert David Borsley | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marc Collinson | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lowri Ann Rees | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Leigh Roberts | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Joy Porter | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Poulton | Trustee | 13 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Adele Evans | Trustee | 11 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Gareth Jones | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Stuart Cole | Trustee | 22 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.