Trustees THE FRIENDS OF ARUNDEL CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 1078149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PATRICK BURGESS Chair
THE THROMBOSIS RESEARCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOHN YOUNG CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Overdue by 76 days
THE THROMBOSIS RESEARCH INSTITUTE
Received: On time
WEST SUSSEX D OF E SUPPORT CIO
Received: On time
ARUNDEL AND BRIGHTON DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
margaret burgess Trustee 23 November 2022
None on record
NICHOLA ANNE HUDSON Trustee 23 November 2022
None on record
Dr SANDRA DIANE WILLIAMS Trustee 23 November 2022
None on record
Dr Sandra Diane Williams Trustee 23 October 2022
None on record
MARIA WHITEHOUSE Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
MARTIN HALL Trustee 20 October 2019
None on record
Charles Sommer Trustee 20 October 2019
None on record
Rev DAVID PARMITER Trustee 20 October 2019
None on record
PAUL WALKER Trustee 20 October 2019
None on record
MARGARET BAMFORD Trustee 15 October 2017
None on record
ELIZABETH MCCOMBE Trustee 15 October 2017
None on record
NIGEL CORBY Trustee 14 March 2017
None on record
Sarah Margaret Kilmartin Trustee 23 November 2015
None on record
Dr JAMES MICHAEL MEADE WALSH Trustee 18 October 2015
None on record
MICHAEL BARRY HEATHCOTE Trustee
None on record