Financial history BROOKHURST HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION BROMBOROUGH

Charity number: 1079902
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £3.96k £4.64k £2.28k £1.62k £4.36k
Total expenditure £5.01k £3.73k £3.39k £889 £598
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A