GLOUCESTERSHIRE ACADEMY OF MUSIC LIMITED

Charity number: 1085708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £267.12k £308.03k £302.93k £298.44k £326.24k
Total expenditure £266.22k £282.59k £310.58k £301.92k £342.76k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £25.00k N/A