BENCHILL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1087821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £330.17k £321.44k £308.22k £307.03k £163.94k
Total expenditure £250.94k £267.38k £270.86k £294.73k £302.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £41.73k £32.98k £31.81k £70.88k £56.51k