FRIENDS OF ST MARY BOURNE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1079350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £23.05k £14.90k £23.11k £8.50k £14.02k
Total expenditure £19.12k £6.25k £17.39k £18.77k £12.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A