Trustees PARSON DROVE PRE-SCHOOL
Charity number: 1079441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Louise Johnson | Chair | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Victoria Hillyard | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joann Elizabeth Handley | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Blyth | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Grooms | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.