AMMANFORD LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1080093
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £3.39k £5.82k £5.97k £15.33k £21.60k
Total expenditure £2.71k £5.12k £6.32k £15.30k £13.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A