Governing document CENTENARY THEATRE COMPANY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 NOVEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 19 JUNE 1984, 1 MAY 1986, 27 MAY 1993, 22 APRIL 1999, 23 NOVEMBER 1999, 11 APRIL 2000 AND 14 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTES IN THE SAID ARTS, TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE GENERAL COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.