Financial history TNB GARRISON EARLY YEARS AND PLAY

Charity number: 1079392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.65m £1.89m £1.90m £1.96m £2.44m
Total expenditure £1.55m £1.76m £1.89m £2.07m £2.31m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £623.80k £1.10k £884.37k £1.03m £1.04m
Income - Donations and legacies £7.42k £1.10k £1.00k £500 £68.93k
Income - Other trading activities £2.82k £3.35k £0 £330 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.64m £1.88m £1.90m £1.96m £2.38m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £713
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.54m £1.76m £1.89m £2.07m £2.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £7.42k £0 £0 £500 £0