FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S ABBOTSKERSWELL

Charity number: 1080907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.38k £6.94k £7.11k £7.92k £6.44k
Total expenditure £2.52k £2.70k £3.95k £3.95k £5.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A