Financial history CHAIN OF HOPE

Charity number: 1081384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.85m £4.27m £4.26m £2.00m £2.09m
Total expenditure £4.54m £4.76m £4.84m £2.08m £2.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £142.40k £11.59k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.04m £3.52m £3.88m £1.72m £2.05m
Income - Other trading activities £790.24k £724.61k £376.36k £135.39k £26.32k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.75k £21.59k £10.97k £380 £236
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £142.40k £11.59k
Income - Legacies £0 £9.74k £405 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.72m £3.79m £3.86m £1.78m £1.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £825.36k £969.99k £979.53k £297.20k £330.37k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £29.27k £0 £31.00k £47.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £96.82k £142.01k £743.87k £66.88k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0