Financial history BEN'S CENTRE FOR VULNERABLE PEOPLE (SHEFFIELD)

Charity number: 1087606
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £130.62k £119.03k £176.36k £353.48k £338.07k
Total expenditure £141.22k £110.44k £148.69k £229.98k £293.05k
Income from government contracts £57.68k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.70k £54.61k £53.15k £57.28k £61.88k