Financial history THE WHITLEY FUND FOR NATURE

Charity number: 1081455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £1.33m £2.31m £1.74m £1.70m £1.89m
Total expenditure £1.28m £1.95m £1.40m £1.68m £1.89m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.32m £1.63m £1.71m £1.70m £1.83m
Income - Other trading activities £6.53k £676.25k £24.15k £3.81k £60.63k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.91k £5.34k £8.12k £2.30k £2.15k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.14m £1.56m £1.27m £1.56m £1.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £140.60k £389.11k £133.34k £123.82k £144.39k
Expenditure - Governance £6.93k £8.85k £7.38k £5.64k £4.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.33m £0 £1.28m £1.40m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0