Financial history MRS IRIS NOREEN SETCHELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1084274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 13/03/2017 13/03/2018 13/03/2019 13/03/2020 13/03/2021
Total gross income £63.63k £62.52k £62.31k £31.02k £23.72k
Total expenditure £59.86k £62.73k £62.80k £60.34k £48.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A