Trustees WELSH AIR AMBULANCE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 1083645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GILBERT OBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Ley | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Louise Rachael Church | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Lee Burdge | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Locke | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Owain Spencer Davies | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Wagstaffe | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Curtis | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAFYDD JONES-MORRIS | Trustee | 30 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr KYLE JACQUES | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
DES KITTO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK JAMES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.