NATIONAL BIODIVERSITY NETWORK TRUST

Charity number: 1082163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £789.25k £416.22k £467.03k £439.51k £424.58k
Total expenditure £819.31k £406.36k £390.39k £487.39k £429.92k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £286.99k £95.00k N/A £191.71k
Income - Donations and legacies £346.37k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £568 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £442.32k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £819.01k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £304 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A