AMAUDO UK

Charity number: 1084963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £91.32k £38.80k £55.95k £68.61k £65.38k
Total expenditure £77.67k £40.95k £56.93k £67.87k £69.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A