MINHAJ-UL-QURAN WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1084057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.14m £2.30m £2.99m £2.99m £2.81m
Total expenditure £1.60m £1.88m £2.15m £2.24m £2.13m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.95m £2.22m £2.89m £2.87m £2.65m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £189.94k £84.04k £103.49k £123.32k £156.26k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.21m £1.43m £1.68m £1.74m £1.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £242.01k £290.09k £274.84k £304.37k £247.18k
Expenditure - Governance £3.60k £3.80k £21.36k £4.85k £5.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £145.22k
Expenditure - Other £143.42k £155.41k £196.78k £195.06k £97.52k