Governing document INTERNATIONAL CANCER IMAGING SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 7TH FEBRUARY 2003, 10TH OCTOBER 2004, 5 MARCH 2006 AND 30 SEPTEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 MAR 2016 as amended on 14 Sep 2020 as amended on 14 Sep 2020 as amended on 14 Sep 2020 as amended on 14 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RESEARCH WITHIN THE FIELD OF ONCOLOGICAL IMAGING AND HUMAN TUMOUR BEHAVIOUR WORLDWIDE INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: (1) THE INTEGRATION OF CROSS SECTIONAL IMAGING TECHNIQUES, INCLUDING COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY, MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING, ULTRASONOGRAPHY AND NUCLEAR MEDICINE TECHNIQUES, CONVENTIONAL RADIOLOGY AND DEVELOPING AND NEW IMAGING MODALITIES (2) THE STUDY AND ANALYSIS OF THE EFFICACY AND OUTCOME OF DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING STUDIES (3) THE PROMOTION OF INTEREST IN ONCOLOGY AND THE FACILITATION OF EXCHANGE OF IDEAS BY THE ORGANISATION OF SCIENTIFIC MEETINGS, MULTICENTRE RESEARCH STUDIES, SEMINARS AND CONFERENCES ON ONCOLOGICAL IMAGING (4) THE PROVISION OF POST GRADUATE COURSES IN ONCOLOGICAL IMAGINING.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.