EAST RAYNHAM BELL TOWER

Charity number: 1082149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 07 April 2021 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 07 April 2021 372 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 07 April 2021 738 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 12 October 2017 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required