Governing document SHERBORNE SCHOOL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/05/2014 as amended on 28 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE CARRYING ON IN OR NEAR SHERBORNE OF A BOARDING AND DAY SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS AND BY INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
IN OR NEAR SHERBORNE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.