LONDON BACH SOCIETY

Charity number: 1082788
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £59.78k £46.20k £64.89k £37.13k £43.57k
Total expenditure £51.57k £48.76k £67.72k £45.44k £22.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.41k £0 £14.50k N/A N/A