CHILDREN OF FIJI

Charity number: 1082331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 14/01/2016 14/01/2017 14/01/2018 14/01/2019 14/01/2020
Total gross income £43.44k £40.40k £42.71k £22.71k £15.53k
Total expenditure £30.76k £68.75k £33.47k £50.38k £9.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A