BANGLADESHI PARENTS AND CARERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1082770
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £738.10k £736.73k £698.58k £774.52k £728.52k
Total expenditure £639.53k £681.60k £781.57k £892.26k £757.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £690.26k £774.52k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.23k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £726.51k £722.15k £690.26k £757.32k £712.57k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4 £0 £0 £0 £21
Income - Other £8.35k £14.58k £8.32k £17.21k £15.92k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £639.25k £681.56k £781.57k £891.72k £757.58k
Expenditure - Raising funds £274 £44 £0 £545 £0
Expenditure - Governance £128.80k £5.91k £0 £217.07k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0